blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3916094

EP3916094 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR SKIN CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.01.2025
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.10.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2025Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.03.2025  [2025/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ractigen Therapeutics
Bldg. 18, Life & Health Industry Park
Rudong Gaoxin District
No. 888 Zhujiang Road
Juegang Street, Rudong County
Nantong, Jiangsu 226400 / CN
[2021/48]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Longcheng
Bldg.18, Rudong Life & Health Industry Park 888
Zhujiang Rd, Rudong
Nantong City, Jiangsu 226400 / CN
02 / KANG, MooRim
Bldg.18, Rudong Life & Health Industry Park 888
Zhujiang Rd, Rudong
Nantong City, Jiangsu 226400 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2021/48]01 / LI, Longcheng
Nantong City, Jiangsu 226400 / CN
02 / KANG, MooRim
Nantong City, Jiangsu 226400 / CN
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[2021/48]
Application number, filing date20745053.722.01.2020
[2021/48]
WO2020CN73663
Priority number, dateCN2019106762524.01.2019         Original published format: CN201910067625
[2021/48]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020151726
Date:30.07.2020
Language:ZH
[2020/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3916094
Date:01.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.07.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/113, A61K48/00, A61K31/713, A61P17/00
[2021/48]
CPC:
A61Q19/00 (EP,CN,KR); C12N15/113 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K8/606 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,CN); A61Q19/08 (EP,CN,US); C12N15/85 (CN);
C12N15/86 (CN,KR); C12N2310/14 (EP,CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/48]
TitleGerman:OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUR HAUTPFLEGE[2021/48]
English:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR SKIN CARE[2021/48]
French:OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES POUR LE SOIN DE LA PEAU[2021/48]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2020Translation filed 
24.08.2021National basic fee paid 
24.08.2021Search fee paid 
24.08.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2021Examination requested  [2021/48]
14.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2025Application withdrawn by applicant  [2025/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]KR20180076791  (GENECELLPAHRM [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* examples 2-5 *;
 [XI]US2018305689  (SÆTROM PÅL [NO], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14 * table 1 * * paragraph [0019] * * sequences 385611, 1304562, 714972, 1448049, 708439, 216623 * * sequences 100707, 714976, 714977 * * paragraph [0295] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0225] - paragraph [0276] * [I] 7,10,13,15
International search[A]WO2015162422  (MINA THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8, 11-28, 36-37;
 [A]CN106032532  (PEKING UNION MEDICAL COLLEGE HOSPITAL CAMS) [A] 1-8,11-28, 36-37;
 [A]  - CHEN Zhong et al., "Recent Advances in RNA Activation", Journal of Contemporary Urologic and Reproductive Oncology, (20120422), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1674-4624, pages 65 - 67, XP009529845 [A] 1-8, 11-28, 36-37
 [A]  - Vera Huang, Qin Yi, Wang Ji, Wang Xiaoling, Place Robert F., Lin Guiting, Lue Tom F., Li Long-Cheng, "RNAa Is Conserved in Mammalian Cells", PLOS ONE, (20100122), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1932-6203, page e8848, XP055727913 [A] 1-8, 11-28, 36-37 * , *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0008848
by applicant   - SCHRADER et al., Skin Pharmacol Physiol, (20120000), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 192 - 9
    - LI et al., Australasian Journal of Dermatology, (20100500), vol. 51, no. 2, pages 106 - 12
    - HAMMAM et al., Advances in Environmental Biology, (20160100), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 237 - 49
    - DUMAS et al., Journal of drugs in dermatology, (20070600), vol. 6, pages 20 - 4
    - KARLSSON et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20130000), vol. 430, pages 993 - 998
    - FLEISCHMAJER et al., Biochem. Biophys. Acta., (19720000), vol. 279, pages 265 - 275
    - Carbohydr. Res., vol. 159, pages 127 - 136
    - Int. J. Dermatol., vol. 33, pages 119 - 122
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.