EP4185866 - A SCREENING METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING GROWTH HORMONE DEFICIENCY IN PEDIATRIC PATIENTS BY USING MACIMORELIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aeterna Zentaris GmbH Weismüllerstrasse 50 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMMER, Nicola 60314 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
TEIFEL, Michael 60314 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
AUE, Beate 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 20745175.8 | 22.07.2020 | [2023/22] | WO2020EP70691 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022017599 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185866 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/74 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/5091 (EP,IL);
G01N33/74 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
G01N2333/61 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | 09.02.2023 | ME | 09.02.2023 | Validation states | KH | 09.02.2023 | MA | 09.02.2023 | MD | 09.02.2023 | TN | 09.02.2023 | Title | German: | SCREENING-VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON WACHSTUMSHORMONMANGEL BEI PÄDIATRISCHEN PATIENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MACIMORELIN | [2023/22] | English: | A SCREENING METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING GROWTH HORMONE DEFICIENCY IN PEDIATRIC PATIENTS BY USING MACIMORELIN | [2023/22] | French: | MÉTHODE DE CRIBLAGE PERMETTANT LE DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE DÉFICIENCE EN HORMONE DE CROISSANCE CHEZ DES PATIENTS PÉDIATRIQUES À L'AIDE DE LA MACIMORÉLINE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2019121762 (AETERNA ZENTARIS GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-39* example -; claim - *; | [ID] - GARCIA JOSE M ET AL, "Macimorelin as a Diagnostic Test for Adult GH Deficiency", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, vol. 103, no. 8, doi:10.1210/JC.2018-00665, ISSN 0021-972X, (20180731), pages 3083 - 3093, (20180531), XP009510784 [ID] 1-39 * page 3083 - page 3088 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.2018-00665 | [I] - YUEN KEVIN C.J. ET AL, "American Association of Clinical Endocrinologists and American College of Endocrinology Guidelines for Management of Growth Hormone Deficiency in Adults and Patients Transitioning from Pediatric to Adult Care", ENDOCRINE PRACTICE, US, (20191101), vol. 25, no. 11, doi:10.4158/GL-2019-0405, ISSN 1530-891X, pages 1191 - 1232, XP055793527 [I] 1-39 * page 1208 - page 1210 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4158/GL-2019-0405 | [I] - Aeterna Zentaris Inc, "Aeterna Zentaris Announces Completion of Patient Recruitment in Dose-Finding Pediatric Study of Macimorelin", GLOBE NEWSWIRE, CHARLESTON, (20200128), AP news PRESS RELEASE: Paid content from Globe Newswire, URL: https://apnews.com/press-release/Globe%2520Newswire/26d83084d17e6036635b35d0efbb2a52, (20210408), XP055793740 [I] 1-39 * the whole document * | [I] - Jm Garcia, "Validation of Macimorelin As a Diagnostic Test for Adult Growth Hormone Deficiency (AGHD): A Phase 3 Study in Comparison with the Insulin Tolerance Test (ITT)", (20170402), URL: https://www.endocrine.org/meetings/endo-annual-meetings/abstract-details?id=33160, (20190129), XP055548557 [I] 1-39 * page 1 - page 2 * | [I] - AGRAWAL VRINDA ET AL, "The macimorelin-stimulated growth hormone test for adult growth hormone deficiency diagnosis", EXPERT REVIEW OF MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS, EXPERT REVIEWS LTD, GB, (20140630), vol. 14, no. 6, doi:10.1586/14737159.2014.915746, ISSN 1744-8352, pages 647 - 654, XP009510785 [I] 1-39 * page 651 - page 653 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14737159.2014.915746 | by applicant | WO0196300 | US6861409 | WO2007093820 | WO2019121762 |