EP3910272 - HEATING APPARATUS AND REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. Haier Industrial Park No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Haijuan Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
LI, Peng Haier Industrial Park No.1 Haier Road, Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/09] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
WANG, Haijuan Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Peng Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | Representative(s) | Ziebig Hengelhaupt Intellectual Property Attorneys Patentanwaltskanzlei PartGmbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Ziebig Hengelhaupt Intellectual Property Attorneys Patentanwaltsanwaltskanzlei PartGmbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2021/46] | Ziebig & Hengelhaupt Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 20745742.5 | 17.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020CN72796 | Priority number, date | CN20191064958 | 23.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910064958 | [2021/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020151595 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910272 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3910272 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/12, A23L3/365, H05B6/64, F25D31/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
F25D31/005 (EP);
F25D23/12 (EP,CN,US);
A23L3/365 (EP,CN,US);
H05B6/12 (CN);
H05B6/642 (US);
H05B6/688 (US);
H05B6/80 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (US);
H05B2206/02 (CN);
H05B6/72 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | F25D23/12, A23L3/365, H05B6/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZGERÄT UND KÜHLSCHRANK | [2021/46] | English: | HEATING APPARATUS AND REFRIGERATOR | [2021/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2021 | Translation filed | 09.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 14.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011135863 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10* figures 1-28 *; | [X]WO2011152047 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 1-19 *; | [XI]CN102754522 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figures 1-18 * [I] 3-7,10 | International search | [A]JP2005180721 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]KR20060058519 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [X]CN102754522 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1, 2, 5, 8, 9 * description, paragraphs [0050]-[0127], figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2013072618 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN106288626 (HEFEI HUALING CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [X]CN207247702U (QINGDAO HAIER INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY RES & DEV CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0050]-[0082], figures 1-10 *; | [PX]CN209893774U (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0049]-[0090], figures 1-11 *; | [PX]CN209897305U (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0052]-[0096], figures 1-11 *; | [PX]CN209897304U (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD) [PX] 1-3, 5-8 * description, paragraphs [0050]-[0086], figures 1-8 *; | [PX]CN209893780U (QINGDAO HAIER CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0043]-[0080], figures 1-9 * |