EP3914163 - CANCER DIAGNOSIS AND MONITORING APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gina-Life Diagnostics Ltd. Nateev HaOr 1 3508510 Haifa / IL | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEHUDAI-RESHEF, Shlomit Carmel Veyam st. 60 3084500 Habonim / IL | 02 /
MICHAELY, Roni Hayasmin 6 4663106 Herzelia / IL | 03 /
YEHEZKELY-HAYON, Daniella Kibbutz Yifat 3658300 Kibbutz Yifat / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
YEHUDAI-RESHEF, Shlomit 3084500 Habonim / IL | ||
02 /
MICHAELY, Roni 4663106 Herzelia / IL | |||
03 /
YEHEZKELY-HAYON, Daniella 3658300 Kibbutz Yifat / IL | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20745938.9 | 22.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020IL50085 | Priority number, date | US201962795891P | 23.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962795891 P | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020152679 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3914163 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61B10/00, G01N33/52, A61F13/15 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A61B10/0045 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/57449 (EP,US);
A61F13/2077 (US);
A61F13/472 (US);
A61F13/84 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
G01N33/528 (EP,IL,US);
G01N33/57411 (EP,US);
G01N33/57442 (EP,US);
G01N33/57488 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2010/0006 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2010/0074 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2013/47281 (US);
A61F2013/8473 (EP,IL);
A61F2013/8488 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | A61B10/00, G01N33/52, G01N33/53, A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KREBSDIAGNOSE UND ÜBERWACHUNG | [2021/48] | English: | CANCER DIAGNOSIS AND MONITORING APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS THEREOF | [2021/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE SURVEILLANCE DU CANCER, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4266022 (LAMPRECHT WALTHER) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 2 *; | [Y]US4724204 (STEINBACH ROLAND W [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 14 - line 42 * * column 4, line 16 - line 20 * * column 7, line 35 - line 41 * * column 7, line 51 - line 57 * * Example; column 9 - column 17 * * claims 1-8 * * the whole document * * in particular: *; | [Y]WO0145757 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [Y] 4,5 * bridging par.; page 3 - page 4 * * page 5, line 10 - line 18 * * claims 17-19 *; | [Y]US2006025732 (YING NAI-KO [TW], et al) [Y] 10 * the whole document * * in particular: * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]US2006140924 (SCHROEDER KARYN C [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0009] , [0010] , [0027] , [0028] *; | [Y]TW201329450 (UNIV NAT SUN YAT SEN [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * paragraphs [0012] , [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * examples 1,3 *; | [A]WO2015092046 (UNIV DUBLIN [IE]) [A] 1-15* page 2, line 20 - line 24 *; | [Y]WO2016028497 (NASERI SARA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraphs [0096] , [0097] , [0103] , [0104] , [0125] , [0131] * * pages 1-4,9; figures 1-4,9 *; | [Y]WO2017161378 (QURASENSE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: * * column 0110 - column 0113 * * paragraphs [0120] , [0129] - paragraph [0135] *; | [Y] - SONODA KENZO ET AL, "A novel tumor-associated antigen expressed in human uterine and ovarian carcinomas", CANCER, US, (19960415), vol. 77, no. 8, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19960415)77:8<1501::AID-CNCR12>3.0.CO;2-3, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1501 - 1509, XP055896752 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19960415)77:8<1501::AID-CNCR12>3.0.CO;2-3 | [Y] - SONODA K ET AL, "Tumor-associated antigen 22-1-1 expression in the uterine cervical squamous neoplasias", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (19980601), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1517 - 1520, XP055896432 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - KATIE COTTINGHAM, "Meeting News: Speeding up biomarker discovery", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (20060501), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1021/pr062722g, ISSN 1535-3893, pages 1047 - 1048, XP055003904 [A] 1-15 * column r, line 18 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/pr062722g | International search | [A]US6426227 (KRITZMAN AMNON [IL], et al) [A] 1-45 * The whole document *; | [X]TW201329450 (UNIV NAT SUN YAT SEN [TW]) [X] 1-8, 10, 14-22, 24-45 * The whole document *; | [A]US2013331666 (MILLER SETH ADRIAN [US]) [A] 1-45 * The whole document *; | [A]US2015241453 (FINAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * The whole document *; | [A]US2015346212 (MOR GIDEON [IL]) [A] 1-45 * The whole document *; | [X]US2016324506 (TARIYAL RIDHI [US], et al) [X] 1-11, 14-22, 24-45 * The whole document *; | [X]JP2017532576 (Qurasense INC) [X] 1-45 * The whole document *; | [A]US2018184976 (KUNIAVSKY MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-45* The whole document *; | [A]WO2018207970 (TCM BIOSCIENCES INC [KR]) [A] 1-45 * The whole document * | by applicant | US4266022 | US4724204 | WO0145757 | US2006025732 | US2006140924 | TW201329450 | WO2016028497 | WO2017161378 | - KENZO SONODA et al., "A Novel Tumor-Associated Antigen Expressed in Human Uterine and Ovarian Carcinomas", CANCER, vol. 77, no. 8, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19960415)77:8<1501::AID-CNCR12>3.0.CO;2-3, XP055896752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19960415)77:8<1501::AID-CNCR12>3.0.CO;2-3 | - KENZO SONODA et al., "Tumor-associated Antigen 22-1-1 Expression in the Uterine Cervical Squamous Neoplasias", Clinical Cancer Research, vol. 4, no. 6, XP055896432 |