EP3976167 - IMPLANTABLE ELECTRICAL LEADS AND ASSOCIATED DELIVERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atacor Medical, Inc. 635 Camino de los Mares, Suite 205 San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANGHERA, Rick Suite 205 635 Camino de los Mares San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 02 /
ROLLINS, Matthew Suite 205 635 Camino de los Mares San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 03 /
BECK, John Suite 205 635 Camino de los Mares San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 04 /
BORN, William Suite 205 635 Camino de los Mares San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 05 /
SAGE, Shahn Suite 205 635 Camino de los Mares San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 06 /
MARCOVECCHIO, Alan Suite 205 635 Camino de los Mares San Clemente, California 92673 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Carroll, Christopher P. AFS International Services LLC 4-12 Regent Street, 4th Floor London SW1Y 4PE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Carroll, Christopher P. Burns & Levinson London LLP 4-12 Regent Street, 4th Floor London SW1Y 4PE / GB | Application number, filing date | 20746391.0 | 29.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US35268 | Priority number, date | US201962854178P | 29.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962854178 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020243534 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976167 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61B17/34, A61N1/362, A61N1/39 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61N1/0587 (EP);
A61N1/0597 (US);
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (US);
A61N1/37 (US);
A61B2017/00367 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (US);
A61N1/362 (EP);
A61N1/372 (EP);
A61N1/3956 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE ELEKTRISCHE ELEKTRODEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE FREISETZUNGSSYSTEME | [2022/14] | English: | IMPLANTABLE ELECTRICAL LEADS AND ASSOCIATED DELIVERY SYSTEMS | [2022/14] | French: | FILS ÉLECTRIQUES IMPLANTABLES ET SYSTÈMES DE MISE EN PLACE ASSOCIÉS | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 20.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US7353067 (HELLAND JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]EP3173043 (SHIFAMED HOLDINGS LLC [US]) |