EP3977290 - THIRD PARTY APPLICATION PERFORMANCE IMPROVEMENT TOOLKIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VYAS, Amit K. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
PATHAK, Abhinav One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
NEWNAM, Anthony R. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
AZAR, Phillip J. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
PATRO, Ashish One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
KARANDIKAR, Prajakta S. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
ETTER, Daniel J. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 08 /
O'REILLY, Conor J. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 09 /
BERGEN, Andreas C. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 10 /
BHANDARI, Nehal One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 11 /
LALE, Jeffrey S. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 12 /
SAKAI, Andrew P. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 13 /
LONG, Terrence R. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 14 /
SPIES, Soren C. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20746428.0 | 29.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US35438 | Priority number, date | US201962855288P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855288 P | US201916671093 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: US201916671093 | US201916671128 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: US201916671128 | US201916671144 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: US201916671144 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020243656 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977290 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977290 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/34, G06F11/32, G06F11/30 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G06F11/3409 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/3013 (EP,CN);
G06F11/302 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3062 (EP,CN);
G06F11/323 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3452 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/3476 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3495 (EP,CN);
G06F11/3612 (US);
G06F11/364 (US);
G06F16/904 (US);
G06F16/906 (US);
G06F17/18 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F9/54 (US);
G06F2201/865 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRITT ANWENDUNG FÜR DIE LEISTUNGSTEIGERUNG EINES WERKZEUGSATZES | [2024/04] | English: | THIRD PARTY APPLICATION PERFORMANCE IMPROVEMENT TOOLKIT | [2022/14] | French: | APPLICATION TIERCE POUR L'AMELIORATION DE PERFORMANCE DE JEU D'INSTRUMENT | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/14] | TOOLKIT ZUR LEISTUNGSVERBESSERUNG EINER ANWENDUNG VON DRITTEN | ||
Former [2022/14] | BOÎTE À OUTILS AMÉLIORANT LES PERFORMANCES D'UNE APPLICATION TIERCE | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 25.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24185731.7 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2012120078 (HUBBARD ERIC [US]); | [A]US2015346797 (WOOLF CHAD B [US]); | [Y]US9842017 (ZHANG YUZHI [US], et al); | [A]US2018373617 (GAIER DANIEL J [US], et al) |