EP4003447 - LOW-PROFILE FLUID CONDUCTORS WITH MOISTURE MANAGEMENT FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/39] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2022/22] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, Thomas Alan Post Office Box 659508 San Antonio, Texas 78265 / US | 02 /
LOCKE, Christopher Brian Post Office Box 659508 San Antonio, Texas 78265 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20747134.3 | 22.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020IB56912 | Priority number, date | US201962878804P | 26.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962878804 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019372 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003447 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61F13/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
A61M1/964 (EP,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61M1/913 (EP);
A61M1/915 (EP,US);
A61M1/85 (EP,US);
A61M1/92 (EP,US);
A61M2205/7536 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | FLACHE FLÜSSIGKEITSLEITUNGEN MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSMANAGEMENTFUNKTIONEN | [2022/22] | English: | LOW-PROFILE FLUID CONDUCTORS WITH MOISTURE MANAGEMENT FEATURES | [2022/22] | French: | CONDUCTEURS DE FLUIDE À PROFIL BAS DOTÉS DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE GESTION D'HUMIDITÉ | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 21.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0007653 (HILL ROM CO INC [US], et al); | [A]US2010087767 (MCNEIL BRUCE [US]); | [A]US2011230849 (COULTHARD RICHARD DANIEL JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]US9050398 (ARMSTRONG ED [US], et al); | [A]US2019117861 (LOCKE CHRISTOPHER BRIAN [GB], et al); | [A]WO2019083607 (KCI LICENSING INC [US]); | [AP]WO2020102214 (KCI LICENSING INC [US]) |