EP3980269 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SELECTION OF PROCESSING PARAMETER FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING USING SIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Materialise NV Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOVANI, Yogesh c/o Materialise N.V. Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20747252.3 | 03.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020US35992 | Priority number, date | US201962858907P | 07.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962858907 P | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020247544 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980269 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y50/02, G06F30/23 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B33Y50/02 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (US);
B29C64/182 (US);
G06F30/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES VERARBEITUNGSPARAMETERS ZUR ADDITIVEN HERSTELLUNG MITTELS SIMULATION | [2022/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SELECTION OF PROCESSING PARAMETER FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING USING SIMULATION | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA SÉLECTION DE PARAMÈTRE DE TRAITEMENT POUR UNE FABRICATION ADDITIVE À L'AIDE D'UNE SIMULATION | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 13.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3232351 (BURLATSKY SERGEI F [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document ** paragraphs [0045] - [0047] *; | [I]WO2018217903 (RELATIVITY SPACE INC [US]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0071] , [0 73] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0 69] * * paragraph [0054] *; | [I]WO2019070644 (ARCONIC INC [US]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraphs [0103] , [ 104] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0119] *; | [I] - LI YINGLI ET AL, "Heat transfer and phase transition in the selective laser melting process", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HEAT AND MASS TRANSFER, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170206), vol. 108, doi:10.1016/J.IJHEATMASSTRANSFER.2017.01.093, ISSN 0017-9310, pages 2408 - 2416, XP029923182 [I] 1-11 * the whole document * * page 2408, column 1, paragraph 2 * * equations 1, 5, 8 and 10 * * page 2410, column 2, paragraph 6 * * page 2412, column 2, paragraphs 5, 6; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijheatmasstransfer.2017.01.093 |