EP3930665 - ACRYLATE AND SILICON-FREE COSMETIC O/W EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKUBSCH, Kerstin Hauptstraße 99 25497 Prisdorf / DE | 02 /
FRANCK, Kerstin Am Katenhof 1 25451 Quickborn / DE | 03 /
VOIGT, Nadine Vierbergen 32 c 22111 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
NEBEN, Jette Mareike Hagenbeckstraße 154a 22527 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
WISCHHÖFER, Svea Zur Guten Hoffnung 10 21109 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
HERWIG, Katharina Veilchenweg 28 A 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SKUBSCH, Kerstin 25497 Prisdorf / DE | ||
02 /
FRANCK, Kerstin 25451 Quickborn / DE | |||
03 /
VOIGT, Nadine 22111 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
NEBEN, Jette Mareike 22527 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
WISCHHÖFER, Svea 21109 Hamburg / DE | |||
06 /
HERWIG, Katharina 22529 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/01] | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20747379.4 | 27.07.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020EP71103 | Priority number, date | DE201910212913 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019212913 | [2022/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037455 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930665 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3930665 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61K8/37, A61K8/46, A61K8/73, A61Q19/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/922 (CN,US);
A61Q19/10 (CN);
A61K2800/10 (CN);
A61K2800/30 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2800/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACRYLAT- UND SILIKONFREIE KOSMETISCHE O/W-EMULSION | [2022/01] | English: | ACRYLATE AND SILICON-FREE COSMETIC O/W EMULSION | [2022/01] | French: | ÉMULSION H/E COSMÉTIQUE EXEMPTE D'ACRYLATE ET DE SILICIUM | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1294772 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]); | [A]WO2007017196 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [A]WO2008003685 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [A]EP1935394 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) | Examination | EP4021380 | EP4021382 | by applicant | DE19938756 | DE29924371U | DE10148825 |