EP4007671 - WELDING SYSTEM AND WELDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRONIUS INTERNATIONAL GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENNSBRUNNER, Helmut c/o FRONIUS INTERNATIONAL GMBH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | 02 /
REINTHALER, Günther c/o FRONIUS INTERNATIONAL GMBH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | SONN Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 20747413.1 | 30.07.2020 | [2022/23] | WO2020EP71519 | Priority number, date | EP20190189617 | 01.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19189617 | [2022/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019019 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4007671 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/095, B23K31/12, B23K9/09 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
B23K9/0956 (EP,KR,US);
B23K9/0953 (EP,KR);
B23K9/091 (EP,KR,US);
B23K31/125 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Title | German: | SCHWEIßSYSTEM UND SCHWEIßVERFAHREN | [2022/23] | English: | WELDING SYSTEM AND WELDING METHOD | [2022/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOUDAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE | [2022/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004034608 (DE MIRANDA HELIO CORDEIRO [BR], et al); | by applicant | US2004034608 | EP2475489 |