EP3907893 - ANTENNA CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xin No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
YANG, Xin Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20748076.5 | 02.01.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020CN70106 | Priority number, date | CN20191082404 | 28.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910082404 | CN201910226175 | 25.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910226175 | [2021/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156021 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907893 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/3827, H04B1/401, H04B7/0404, H04W88/06 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H04B1/3838 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/42 (US);
H04B1/401 (CN);
H04B1/44 (EP,US);
H04B17/102 (EP);
H04B7/0404 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | ANTENNENSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/45] | English: | ANTENNA CONTROL METHOD AND SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'ANTENNES, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2021 | Translation filed | 04.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN102270999 (SHENZHEN FUTAIHONG PRECISION INDUSTRY CO., LTD. et al.) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [X]EP2928086 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 16-45, figures 1-2 *; | [X]US2018316379 (CHANG CHING WEI [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 11, 30, 51-69, 91, figures 1-8, 15-17 *; | [A]CN108832281 (AAC PRECISION MANUFACTURE TECH CHANGZHOU CO LTD) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [PX]CN109962719 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * claims, and description * |