EP3918120 - YARN, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING YARN AND PRODUCTS FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMC Limited C/-Baker Tilly Staples Rodway Auckland Ltd Level 9, 45 Queen Street Auckland, 1010 / NZ | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYNNE, Andrew George 31 Western Rise RD 20 Levin, 5570 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
WYNNE, Andrew George Levin, 5570 / NZ | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20748131.8 | 30.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020NZ50003 | Priority number, date | NZ20030197503 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: NZ 19750303 | NZ19756477 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: NZ 19756477 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020159387 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918120 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/04, D02G3/28 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
D02G3/286 (EP,AU,US);
D02G3/04 (AU,US);
D02G3/36 (EP,US);
D02G3/02 (EP);
D10B2211/02 (EP,US);
D10B2331/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | GARN, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GARN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE | [2021/49] | English: | YARN, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING YARN AND PRODUCTS FORMED THEREFROM | [2021/49] | French: | FIL, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE FIL ET PRODUITS FORMÉS À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR1536932 (IWS NOMINEE CO LTD); | [Y]US3488939 (WALLS GORDON W); | [Y]US3596459 (WADA OSAMU, et al); | [XYI]JPS61275428 (UNITIKA LTD) | International search | [X]US3153838 (PINSON JR MARVIN J); | [X]US4662164 (MORRISON ELBERT F [US]); | [X]JPH04108131 (KANEBO LTD); | [X]US6460322 (SATO KOICHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | FR1536932 | US3488939 | US3596459 | WO2004044290 | NZ522596 | WO2008079025 | NZ552416 | US7752832 | US8429889 |