EP3895939 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE AND SECURITY VERIFICATION METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI Hiroki c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD., 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
KANEKO Shuhei c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD., 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 03 /
MORITA Nobuyoshi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 20748559.0 | 15.01.2020 | [2021/42] | WO2020JP00950 | Priority number, date | JP20190013764 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019013764 | [2021/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158377 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895939 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3895939 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F9/4401, B60R16/023 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
B60R16/02 (US);
G06F9/4401 (EP);
G06F9/4418 (US);
B60R16/023 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | B60R16/02, G06F21/57 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERHEITSÜBERPRÜFUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/42] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE AND SECURITY VERIFICATION METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION DE SÉCURITÉ POUR DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | Translation filed | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013125244 (SUGANO YASUHARU [JP]); | [A]US2015074384 (YAJIMA JUN [JP], et al); | [I]US2017255384 (HASHIMOTO MIKIO [JP], et al) | International search | [YA]JP2009129322 (DENSO CORP, et al); | [YA]WO2016185577 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [YA]JP2017156945 (TOSHIBA CORP) |