EP3919275 - LIQUID DISCHARGE HEAD AND RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMATA, Shuhei c/o Kyocera Corporation, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KAWAMATA, Shuhei Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20748916.2 | 28.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020JP02905 | Priority number, date | JP20190016187 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019016187 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158705 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919275 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B41J2/14209 (EP);
B41J25/34 (US);
B41J2002/14225 (EP);
B41J2002/14306 (EP);
B41J2002/14362 (EP);
B41J2002/14459 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | B41J2/01, B41J2/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSKOPF UND AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/49] | English: | LIQUID DISCHARGE HEAD AND RECORDING DEVICE | [2021/49] | French: | TÊTE D'ÉVACUATION DE LIQUIDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | Translation filed | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012147088 (NISHIDA HIDEAKI [JP]); | [A]JP2013230596 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [XD]WO2014156829 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]US2005157056 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al) [A] 1-12* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2007301918 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [X]WO2014156829 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-2,12 * paragraphs [0010]-[0011], [0065]-[0080], fig. 1, 6-7 *; | [A]JP2015193160 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2017154488 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2017177676 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2018086827 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | WO2014156829 |