EP3919335 - ELECTRIC CART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evar Co., Ltd. 508, 107, Gwanggyo-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16229 / KR | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hun 5408-1304, 65, Docheong-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16509 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Dong Hyuk 113-1901, 148, Sunae-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13599 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ki Jae 202, 16, Saemal-ro 11-gil, Songpa-gu Seoul 05809 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
LEE, Hun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16509 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIN, Dong Hyuk Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13599 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Ki Jae Seoul 05809 / KR | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | Kurig, Thomas Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20748927.9 | 30.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020KR01393 | Priority number, date | KR20190013389 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190013389 | KR20190013390 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190013390 | KR20190040104 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: KR 20190040104 | [2021/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020159238 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919335 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/09, B60W10/08, B60W50/08, B60W10/18, B60W60/00, B60R21/0134, B60K7/00, B60L15/20, B60L53/31, G05D1/00, G05D1/02, B60L53/53, B60L53/57 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B60L53/57 (EP);
G05D1/0225 (EP,US);
B60K7/00 (EP);
B60L15/20 (EP);
B60L53/36 (US);
B60L53/53 (EP);
B60Q1/46 (US);
B60R21/0134 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W10/18 (EP);
B60W30/09 (EP);
B60W50/08 (EP);
B60W60/00 (EP);
G05D1/0016 (EP);
G05D1/005 (EP);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/617 (US);
G05D1/661 (US);
B60L2260/32 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | B60W30/09, B60W10/08, B60W50/08, B60W10/18, B60W60/00, B60R21/0134, B60K7/00, B60L15/20, B60L53/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER WAGEN | [2021/49] | English: | ELECTRIC CART | [2021/49] | French: | CHARIOT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2020 | Translation filed | 16.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 20.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09202235 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [Y]WO2015159883 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]); | International search | [Y]JPH09202235 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [Y]KR20120001845U ; | [Y]US2012130582 (HUKKERI RAMADEV BURIGSAY [US]); | [Y]KR20130070976 (CLICKNTOUCH CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO2017030188 (CYBERDYNE INC [JP], et al); | [XP]KR102033326B (EVAR [KR]); | [XP]KR102033325B (EVAR [KR]); |