EP3913839 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, NETWORK DEVICE AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Juan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Chaojun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
ZHENG, Juan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Chaojun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20748988.1 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CN74180 | Priority number, date | CN201910109064 | 03.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910109064 | CN201910760324 | 16.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910760324 | [2021/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156559 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913839 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/08 (US);
H04L5/0012 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
H04W48/02 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (CN);
H04W72/0453 (CN);
H04L27/26025 (EP);
H04L5/0026 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/47] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, NETWORK DEVICE AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2021 | Translation filed | 16.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018128427 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0145] *; | [X]WO2018230965 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0108] * | International search | [A]CN104105162 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2018131479 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018128427 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-27* entire document *; | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Remaining Issues of NR-PBCH", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #89 R1-1707929, (20170519), doi:20200417122902A, XP051273127 [A] 1-27 * section 2 * |