EP3919477 - FLUOROVINYLBENZAMIDE COMPOUND AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NovaOnco JS Therapeutics Co., Ltd. Building C, Building 1, No. 11 Longpan Avenue Xuzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Jiangsu Province, 221132 / CN | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states Shanghai Fosun Pharmaceutical Industrial Development Co., Ltd. Building A No.1289 Yishan Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | ||
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Medshine Discovery Inc. Room 218, No. 9 Gaoxin Road Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210032 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yang 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 02 /
XIA, Yuanfeng 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Deheng 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | 04 /
ZUO, Jian 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Zhengxia 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | 06 /
DAI, Meibi 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | 07 /
LI, Jian 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | 08 /
CHEN, Shuhui 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
ZHANG, Yang Shanghai 200131 / CN | ||
02 /
XIA, Yuanfeng Shanghai 200131 / CN | |||
03 /
SUN, Deheng Shanghai 200131 / CN | |||
04 /
ZUO, Jian Shanghai 200131 / CN | |||
05 /
CHEN, Zhengxia Shanghai 200131 / CN | |||
06 /
DAI, Meibi Shanghai 200131 / CN | |||
07 /
LI, Jian Shanghai 200131 / CN | |||
08 /
CHEN, Shuhui Shanghai 200131 / CN | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20749071.5 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020CN74206 | Priority number, date | CN201910107946 | 02.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910107946 | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156568 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919477 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/02, C07D401/02, C07D401/14, C07D403/02, C07D403/14, A61K31/395, A61K31/416, A61P35/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4196 (EP);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | FLUOROVINYLBENZAMIDVERBINDUNG ALS PD-L1-IMMUNMODULATOR | [2021/50] | English: | FLUOROVINYLBENZAMIDE COMPOUND AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATOR | [2021/49] | French: | COMPOSÉ FLUOROVINYLBENZAMIDE UTILE EN TANT QU'IMMUNOMODULATEUR PD-L1 | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/49] | FLUOROVINYLBENZAMIDE COMPOUND AS PD-L1 IMMUNOMODULATOR | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2021 | Translation filed | 20.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1510516 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP3333157 (HARBIN ZHENBAO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [AD] 1-9 * page 10 - page 11; compounds WX-32 and WX-47 * * claim - *; | [E]WO2020156564 (MEDSHINE DISCOVERY INC [CN]) [E] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0210137 (SIGNAL PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * description, page 6, page 7, paragraph 1, and embodiment 240 et al. *; | [A]US2003207883 (RENHOWE PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * description, page 4, right column, and page 5, embodiment 205 et al. *; | [A]CN1656079 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* description, pages 6, 7, 64, 66, and 67 *; | [A]WO2017024968 (MEDSHINE DISCOVERY INC [CN]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-14, abstract, description, page 2, page 52, embodiment 32, and pages 59 and 60, embodiment 47 * | by applicant | WO2017024968 |