EP3913333 - POSITION DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METROL CO., LTD. No.100, Takamatsu-cho 1-chome Tachikawa-shi Tokyo 190-0011 / JP | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA Takamoto c/o Metrol Co., Ltd., 1-100 Takamatsu-cho Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0011 / JP | 02 /
KANNO Takayuki c/o Metrol Co., Ltd., 1-100 Takamatsu-cho Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0011 / JP | [2023/16] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
YOSHIOKA Takamoto Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
KANNO Takayuki Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 5275 102 46 Stockholm / SE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20749152.3 | 27.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020JP02811 | Priority number, date | JP20190015921 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019015921 | [2021/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158677 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913333 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913333 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/34, G01D5/14 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP);
G01D5/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | G01D5/244, G01D5/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONSDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/47] | English: | POSITION DETECTION DEVICE | [2021/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2021 | Translation filed | 16.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 24.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6488302 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 4-6 * pages 6-8 *; | [Y]JP2001221608 (CKD CORP) [Y] 3,6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0066] *; | [Y]JP2009222594 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0008] - [0095] *; | [XY]JP2011169696 (ASAHI KASEI DENSHI KK) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0007] - [0082] * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]JP2013002874 (CANON KK) [Y] 4-6* paragraphs [0012] - [0014]; figure 2 * | International search | [A]JPS6252402 (TOYO KIKAI KK) [A] 1-6 * , page 3, upper left column, line 11 to lower left column, line 19, fig. 1, 2 *; | [YA]JPS6488302 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 4-6 * , page 4, lower left column, line 20, to page 5, upper right column, line 8, fig. 6-9, page 4, lower left column, line 20 to page 5, upper right column, line 8, fig. 6-9 * [A] 1-3; | [YA]JP2001221608 (CKD CORP) [Y] 3, 6 * , paragraphs [0059]-[0075], fig. 1-3, paragraphs [0059]-[0075], fig. 1-3 * [A] 1-2, 4-5; | [A]JP2011038919 (ASAHI KASEI DENSHI KK) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0029], fig. 1-7 *; | [XY]JP2011169696 (ASAHI KASEI DENSHI KK) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0009], [0015]-[0018], [0046], fig. 1-3, paragraphs [0009], [0015]-[0018], [0046], fig. 1-3 * [Y] 3-6; | [A]US2012112769 (PALMER ANTHONY [GB], et al) [A] 1-6* , paragraphs [0004]-[0043], fig. 1-5 *; | [A]JP3189365U (ASAHI KASEI EMD CORP.) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0028], fig. 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2008183699 | JP2019015921 |