EP3828970 - ELECTROLYTIC COPPER FOIL, CURRENT COLLECTOR, ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING ELECTROLYTIC COPPER FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang Chun Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 7F., No. 301 Songjiang Rd. Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City 104 / TW | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Huei-Fang 7th Fl., No.301, Songkiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | 02 /
LAI, Ting-Chun 7th Fl., No.301, Songkiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | 03 /
CHENG, Kuei-Sen 7th Fl., No.301, Songkiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | 04 /
CHOU, Jui-Chang 7th Fl., No.301, Songkiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | 05 /
LAI, Yao-Sheng 7th Fl., No.301, Songkiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/16] | Pallini Gervasi, Diego Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2021/22] | Pallini Gervasi, Diego Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 20749195.2 | 15.01.2020 | [2021/22] | WO2020CN72158 | Priority number, date | US201962800263P | 01.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962800263 P | US201916429921 | 03.06.2019 Original published format: US201916429921 | [2021/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156159 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828970 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828970 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25D1/04, H01M4/66, H01M10/052, // C25D3/38 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C25D1/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B15/01 (US);
B32B15/08 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
C25D3/04 (US);
C25D3/12 (US);
C25D3/22 (US);
C25D3/38 (EP,US);
C25D5/10 (US);
C25D5/14 (US);
C25D5/16 (US);
C25D5/48 (US);
C25D9/08 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/0469 (US);
H01M4/70 (US);
H05K1/0242 (US);
H05K1/09 (US);
H05K1/18 (US);
H05K1/181 (US);
H05K3/384 (US);
H05K3/389 (US);
B32B2255/06 (US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2255/28 (US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
B32B2457/08 (US);
C25D3/08 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP);
H01M2004/027 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H05K2201/0338 (US);
H05K2201/0355 (US);
H05K2201/0373 (US);
H05K2201/10522 (US);
H05K2201/2054 (US);
H05K2203/0307 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | H01M4/66, H01M4/62, C25D1/04, H05K3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTISCHE KUPFERFOLIE, STROMKOLLEKTOR, ELEKTRODE UND LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT ELEKTROLYTISCHER KUPFERFOLIE | [2021/22] | English: | ELECTROLYTIC COPPER FOIL, CURRENT COLLECTOR, ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING ELECTROLYTIC COPPER FOIL | [2021/22] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE, COLLECTEUR DE COURANT, ÉLECTRODE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION COMPRENANT UNE FEUILLE DE CUIVRE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2021 | Translation filed | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | NL | 19.04.2023 | |
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014065431 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-31 *; | [A]WO2014081041 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-8 *; | [A]CN106558703 (LS MTRON LTD) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-13 *; | [A]US2018083309 (HO KAM PIU [HK], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-20 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] * | International search | [A]CN101098005 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-28 * entire document *; | [A]CN101669237 (NIPPON MINING CO) [A] 1-28 * entire document *; | [A]JP2012136736 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-28* entire document *; | [A]TWI417424B (CHANG CHUN PETROCHEMICAL CO [TW]) [A] 1-28 * entire document *; | [Y]CN104812945 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP) [Y] 16-28 * description, paragraphs [0008]-[0153] *; | [A]CN104812945 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP) [A] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0008]-[0153] *; | [Y]CN105986288 (NISSIN MAT CO LTD) [Y] 16-28 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0147] *; | [A]CN105986288 (NISSIN MAT CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0147] * |