Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022260012 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020FR51211 | 08.07.2020 | FR1907970 | 15.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114127396B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2024 | B | CN114127396 | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020FR51211 | 08.07.2020 | FR1907970 | 15.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3999779 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B1 | EP3999779 | 25.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020FR51211 | 08.07.2020 | FR1907970 | 15.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021009439 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1907970 | 15.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3098859 | 28.04.2023 | B1 | FR3098859 | 22.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1907970 | 15.07.2019 |