EP4022196 - HYDRAULIC STOPPER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE SUSPENSION WITH INERTIAL MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/27] | HYDRAULIC STOP WITH INERTIAL MASS FOR MOTOR VEHICLE SUSPENSION | ||
[2023/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/27] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTEIL, Christophe 5 RUE DE FILE ETOUPE 91640 BRIIS SOUS FORGES / FR | 02 /
CHILLON, Jean 18 20 RUE DE SEVRES 92100 BOULOGNE BILLANCOURT / FR | 03 /
DIMITRIJEVIC, Zoran 12 ALLEE DE LA POMMERAIE 91570 BIEVRES / FR | 04 /
ROTA, Laurent 29 RUE PAUL PAYENNEVILLE 91530 ST CHERON / FR | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20750332.7 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020FR51218 | Priority number, date | FR20190009466 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: FR 1909466 | [2022/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038143 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022196 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4022196 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/10, B60G7/04, F16F9/58, B60G15/06 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
F16F7/1034 (EP);
B60G15/06 (EP);
B60G7/04 (EP);
F16F9/58 (EP);
B60G2202/25 (EP);
B60G2202/32 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHER ANSCHLAG FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUGAUFHÄNGUNG MIT TRÄGHEITSMASSE | [2023/16] | English: | HYDRAULIC STOPPER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE SUSPENSION WITH INERTIAL MASS | [2023/16] | French: | BUTEE HYDRAULIQUE DE SUSPENSION DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE A MASSE INERTIELLE | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/27] | HYDRAULISCHER ANSCHLAG MIT TRÄGHEITSMASSE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGAUFHÄNGUNG | ||
Former [2022/27] | HYDRAULIC STOP WITH INERTIAL MASS FOR MOTOR VEHICLE SUSPENSION | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 17.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1221773 (AUTOMOBILWERK EISENACH VEB) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10324993 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR3066571 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-10* page 2, lines 17-24; figure 1 * | by applicant | FR3074244 | FR20190009466 |