EP3994487 - PHASE DEPTH IMAGING USING MACHINE-LEARNED DEPTH AMBIGUITY DEALIASING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLEYER, Michael Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
EDMONDS, Christopher Douglas Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
PRICE, Raymond Kirk Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20751331.8 | 09.06.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020US36740 | Priority number, date | US201916460321 | 02.07.2019 Original published format: US201916460321 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021003003 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994487 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/4915, G01S7/493, G01S17/36, G01S17/894 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G01S17/36 (EP);
G06T5/70 (US);
G01S17/26 (US);
G01S17/89 (US);
G01S17/894 (EP);
G01S7/493 (EP);
G06T7/50 (US);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | PHASENTIEFENBILDGEBUNG MITTELS DE-ALIASING VON MASCHINENERLERNTER TIEFENMEHRDEUTIGKEIT | [2022/19] | English: | PHASE DEPTH IMAGING USING MACHINE-LEARNED DEPTH AMBIGUITY DEALIASING | [2022/19] | French: | IMAGERIE DE PROFONDEUR DE PHASE UTILISANT UN DÉCRÉNELAGE D'AMBIGUÏTÉ DE PROFONDEUR APPRIS PAR MACHINE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 16.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016047913 (LAMESCH LAURENT [LU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0041] - [0047] - [0077] - [0081]; figures 3,6; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US2017272651 (MATHY CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 8-10* paragraphs [0089] - [0114] *; | [Y]US2019101631 (KADAMBI ACHUTA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0102] - [0116] - [0122] , [0178]; figure 2A *; | [Y]CN109712109 (UNIV HANGZHOU DIANZI) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |