EP3927254 - TISSUE CLIPPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2023/45] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAENZ VILLALOBOS, Gonzalo Jose Av 11, Calles 8 y 10, Fatima Heredia, 40101 / CR | 02 /
RYAN, Shawn 22 McIntosh Lane Littleton, Massachusetts 01460 / US | 03 /
SOLANO MONTENEGRO, Esteban 2546 First Street Propark, El Coyol Alajuela / CR | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
SAENZ VILLALOBOS, Gonzalo Jose Heredia, 40101 / CR | ||
02 /
RYAN, Shawn Littleton, Massachusetts 01460 / US | |||
03 /
SOLANO MONTENEGRO, Esteban Propark, El Coyol Alajuela / CR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20751399.5 | 07.07.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US41072 | Priority number, date | US201962879874P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879874 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021397 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927254 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3927254 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/29, A61B17/128, A61B17/00, A61B1/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,KR);
A61B17/1285 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/00234 (CN,US);
A61B1/0053 (US);
A61B1/0057 (US);
A61B1/2736 (US);
A61B17/10 (US);
A61B17/1227 (KR);
A61B1/00098 (EP);
A61B2017/00269 (US);
A61B2017/00296 (CN);
A61B2017/003 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00305 (CN);
A61B2017/00323 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B2017/0034 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBECLIPVORRICHTUNG | [2021/52] | English: | TISSUE CLIPPING DEVICE | [2021/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PINCEMENT DE TISSU | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24166334.3 / EP4374767 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]GB2151142 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD); | [XY]US5820546 (OUCHI TERUO [JP]); | [Y]US2003135204 (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al); | [A]WO2008070556 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]); | [XA]US2009171159 (JORGENSEN GLEN [US], et al); | [YA]US2015087994 (MATSUNO KIYOTAKA [JP], et al); | [Y]US2018140300 (RANDHAWA NISHANT [IN]) | Examination | US2002111534 |