EP4026058 - METHOD TO COMPRESS A NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/28] | METHODS FOR COMPRESSING A NEURAL NETWORK | ||
[2024/20] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLICHT, Peter Osterhop 5 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
KAPOOR, Nikhil Lessingstraße 43 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
VARGHESE, John Serin Ackerstraße 62 38126 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Jan David Dresdner Ring 33 38444 Wolfsburg / DE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20751522.2 | 04.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP71872 | Priority number, date | DE201910213459 | 04.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019213459 | [2022/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043517 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026058 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4026058 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/098, G06N3/045 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/0495 (EP);
G06N3/063 (US);
G06N3/098 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KOMPRIMIEREN EINES NEURONALEN NETZES | [2022/28] | English: | METHOD TO COMPRESS A NEURAL NETWORK | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE COMPRESSION D'UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/28] | METHODS FOR COMPRESSING A NEURAL NETWORK | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 04.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2019114543 (CHEN CHUN-HUNG [TW], et al); |