EP4162350 - CORRECTING TOUCH INPUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Young Seok Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Sun-il Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/15] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 20751847.3 | 03.06.2020 | [2023/15] | WO2020US70117 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021247086 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162350 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/0418 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (US);
G06F3/046 (KR);
G06F2203/04104 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | KORREKTUR VON BERÜHRUNGSEINGABEN | [2023/15] | English: | CORRECTING TOUCH INPUTS | [2023/15] | French: | CORRECTION D'ENTRÉES TACTILES | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 09.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017139527 (NATHAN AROKIA [GB], et al); | [Y]US9874974 (KIM ROONEY [KP], et al); | [Y]US2020159367 (XIA FURONG [CN], et al) |