EP3993751 - ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH IMPROVED LOW VISCOSITY WASTE ACQUISITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTYNUS, Cornelia B. Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 02 /
ROE, Donald C. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
WHITELY, Nathan R. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20751859.8 | 11.06.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020US70139 | Priority number, date | US201916459993 | 02.07.2019 Original published format: US201916459993 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021003491 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993751 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3993751 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/537 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A61F13/53747 (EP,CN);
A61F13/15203 (CN,US);
A61F13/42 (CN,US);
A61F13/495 (CN,US);
A61F13/511 (CN,US);
A61F13/53713 (EP,CN);
A61F13/53756 (US);
A61F13/5376 (EP,CN);
A61F2013/15373 (US);
A61F2013/15463 (CN,US);
A61F2013/15552 (CN,US);
A61F2013/422 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGE ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTER ERFASSUNG VON NIEDRIGVISKOSEM ABFALL | [2022/19] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH IMPROVED LOW VISCOSITY WASTE ACQUISITION | [2022/19] | French: | ARTICLES ABSORBANTS OFFRANT UNE MEILLEURE ACQUISITION DE DÉCHETS À FAIBLE VISCOSITÉ | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XIY]WO9301781 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [XIY]WO0106974 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [XIY]US2010247844 (CURRO JOHN JOSEPH [US], et al) | International search | [XYI]WO9301781 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 7 * * claim 1 * * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 16 - page 17, paragraph 1 * * page 24 - page 33 * * page 42 - page 49 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 5-10,13-15; | [XYI]WO0106974 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-9,13,15 * figures 1,5,6,6A,15-18 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * pages 7-12 * * pages 19-51 * [Y] 1-15[I] 10-12,14; | [XYI]US2010247844 (CURRO JOHN JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11 * figures 1-3,10 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0037] , [0038] , [0043] , [0055] , [0088] - [0096] * [Y] 1-15 [I] 12-15 | by applicant | US5628097 | US7901393 | US2013211363 | US2014005020 | US2016136014 | US9421137 | US9498389 |