EP3920694 - PLUG-IN INSECT TRAP WITH REPLACEABLE ADHESIVE FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamic Solutions Worldwide, LLC 12247 W. Fairview Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCHA, Juan, J. 1558 West Fork Drive Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | 02 /
SEATON, Robert, A. 1 Greenside Circle Verona, WI 53593 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
ROCHA, Juan, J. Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | ||
02 /
SEATON, Robert, A. Verona, WI 53593 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20752424.0 | 04.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US16621 | Priority number, date | US201916269264 | 06.02.2019 Original published format: US201916269264 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163364 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920694 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01M3/04, A01M1/04, H01R13/04 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A01M1/145 (EP,CN,US);
A01M1/10 (CN);
A01M1/16 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | EINSTECKBARE INSEKTENFALLE MIT AUSWECHSELBAREM KLEBENDEM FÄCHER | [2021/50] | English: | PLUG-IN INSECT TRAP WITH REPLACEABLE ADHESIVE FAN | [2021/50] | French: | PIÈGE À INSECTES ENFICHABLE DOTÉ D'UN VENTILATEUR ADHÉSIF REMPLAÇABLE | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2005053389 (ECS ENVIRONMENT CARE SYS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,11,12,14 * please view the detailed citations within the WO * [A] 3,5,6,10,13,15 [Y] 8,9; | [Y]US2016000060 (SANDFORD ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * please view the detailed citations within the WO *; | [X]US2017295772 (STUDER BRUCE R [US], et al) [X] 1,12* paragraph [0015] *; | [X]WO2018131840 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,12 * figure 2 *; | [X]WO2018236147 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,12 * figure 4 * | International search | [A]US6568124 (WILBANKS ALVIN D [US])[A] 1-20; | [YX]US2004200129 (STUDER BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 11-14 [X] 1-10,15-20; | [A]US2010263260 (ENGELBRECHT BERT [NZ], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2014013650 (LARSEN LANCE [CA]) [A] 1-20; | [Y]KR20190000020 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 11-14 |