Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023321473 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016784913 | 07.02.2020 | US202318143769 | 05.05.2023 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11679290 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B2 | US2020254290 | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016784913 | 07.02.2020 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL284528 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | B1 | IL284528 | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US17326 | 07.02.2020 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3124851 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US17326 | 07.02.2020 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020218552 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US17326 | 07.02.2020 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3920943 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2023 | A4 | EP3920943 | 15.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US17326 | 07.02.2020 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021011598 | 31.08.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US17326 | 07.02.2020 | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020163788 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021002038 | 25.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2023003338 | 31.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962802902 | 08.02.2019 |