EP3920792 - BRAIN ACTIVITY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUVENC, Umut c/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 02 /
DE SOUZA, Paulo c/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 03 /
IJI, Ayobami c/- Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
GUVENC, Umut Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | ||
02 /
DE SOUZA, Paulo Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | |||
03 /
IJI, Ayobami Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20753114.6 | 05.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020AU50088 | Priority number, date | AU20190900357 | 05.02.2019 Original published format: AU 2019900357 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020160613 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920792 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/293, A61B5/37, A61B5/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/6868 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/4094 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/002 (AU,US);
A61B5/0022 (AU,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP);
A61B5/14539 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (EP,US);
A61B5/293 (EP,US);
A61B5/31 (AU);
A61B5/37 (EP);
A61B5/4064 (EP);
A61B5/7221 (EP,AU,US);
A61B5/7225 (US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/7282 (EP,AU);
A61B5/742 (AU,US);
A61B5/747 (AU,US);
A61B2560/0209 (AU,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,AU,US);
A61B2562/0209 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0271 (US);
A61B2562/046 (AU,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | A61B5/0476 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG DER GEHIRNAKTIVITÄT | [2021/50] | English: | BRAIN ACTIVITY MONITORING | [2021/50] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE L'ACTIVITÉ CÉRÉBRALE | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02087697 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | [YA]US2003229383 (WHITEHURST TODD K [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005018448 (BRAINZ INSTR LTD [NZ], et al); | [YA]US2005090756 (WOLF PATRICK D [US], et al); | [XY]US2007150025 (DILORENZO DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]WO2007079326 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007213629 (GREENE DAVID [US]); | [A]WO2013160706 (NEUROPRO LTD, et al); | [A]WO2015130955 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]); | [A]US2015289980 (HIRATA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | International search | [X]US7187968 (WOLF PATRICK D [US], et al) [X] 1-15, 17-53, 57-71, 73- 100 * column 3 lines 21 to 46, column 25 lines 20 to 52 *; | [A]US2007146189 (WESSELINK WILLEM A [NL], et al) [A] 14, 39-45, 70, 81-87 * paragraphs 55 and 56 *; | [X]US2013172774 (CROWDER TARA L [US], et al) [X] 1-100 * paragraphs 79, 105, 108 to 113, figure 3 *; | [A]US2014094674 (NURMIKKO ARTO V [US], et al); | [X]US9044188 (DILORENZO DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-100 * column 3 line 38 to column 4 line 12, column 9 line 43 to column 11 line 23, figures 2, 3A, 5, 9, 11 *; | [X]US2015374993 (MORRELL MARTHA J [US]) [X] 1-100 * paragraphs 36, 74 to 78, figures 4, 5 *; | [PX]US2019069787 (LEE HYUNG-MIN [KR], et al) [PX] 1-100* paragraphs 28 to 31, figures 1 and 2 *; | [A] - GROSSELIN, F. et al., "Quality Assessment of Single-Channel EEG for Wearable Devices", Sensors, (20190131), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 1 - 17, XP055731583 [A] 17-25 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s19030601 |