EP3928201 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREFERENCE AND SIMILARITY LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street, NW Atlanta, GA 30318 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street NW Atlanta, GA 30318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANAL, Gregory c/o Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street NW Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | 02 /
ROZELL, Christopher John c/o Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street NW Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | 03 /
FENU, Stefano c/o Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street NW Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | 04 /
DAVENPORT, Mark c/o Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street NW Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | 05 /
MASSIMINO, Andrew c/o Georgia Tech Research Corporation 926 Dalney Street NW Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
CANAL, Gregory Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | ||
02 /
ROZELL, Christopher John Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | |||
03 /
FENU, Stefano Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | |||
04 /
DAVENPORT, Mark Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | |||
05 /
MASSIMINO, Andrew Atlanta, Georgia 30318 / US | Representative(s) | Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20753214.4 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020US16379 | Priority number, date | US201962800666P | 04.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962800666 P | US201962800686P | 04.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962800686 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163224 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928201 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/451, G06F9/445, // G06K9/62 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/4451 (EP);
G06F18/2185 (US);
G06F17/11 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM LERNEN VON PRÄFERENZEN UND ÄHNLICHKEITEN | [2021/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREFERENCE AND SIMILARITY LEARNING | [2021/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'APPRENTISSAGE DE PRÉFÉRENCES ET DE SIMILARITÉS | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 15.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007087756 (HOFFBERG STEVEN M [US]) [Y] 1-24* , entire document, especially para [0319]; [0344]; [0423]; [0444]; [0479] *; | [Y]US2016342902 (PINCKNEY THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * , entire document, especially para [0058]; [0062]; [0063]; [0076]; [0078]; [0080]; [0099]; [0125]; [0180]; [0189]; [0206]; [0208]; [0213-0215]; [0246]; [0256] *; | [X]US2018204111 (ZADEH LOTFI A [US], et al) [X] 25-43 * , entire document, especially para [0700]; [0739]; [0843]; [1254]; [1299]; [1304]; [1320]; [1353]; [1369]; [1534]; [1577]; [1695]; [1750]; [1847]; [1998]; [2101]; [2844] * |