EP4010372 - BIOPHARMACUETICAL COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited GSK Medicines Research Centre Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage SG1 2NY / GB | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property Development Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRANZ, James K. 15 Babbitt Lane Harvard, Massachusetts 01451 / US | 02 /
MOLLOY, Michael Joseph Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
RINELLA, JR., Joseph V. 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Elizabeth Rae 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 05 /
SCHUESSLER, Hillary Amber 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 06 /
SHAH, Tejash Priory Street Ware Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Lucy Rose GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20753451.2 | 31.07.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020IB57267 | Priority number, date | US201962883451P | 06.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962883451 P | US201962948432P | 16.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962948432 P | US202062984110P | 02.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062984110 P | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021024133 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4010372 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61K39/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/6801 (CN);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/804 (EP,CN,IL);
C07K2317/40 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K2317/565 (EP,CN,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | 07.03.2022 | ME | 07.03.2022 | Validation states | MA | 07.03.2022 | Title | German: | BIOPHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2022/24] | English: | BIOPHARMACUETICAL COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS | [2022/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS BIOPHARMACEUTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 07.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2019053612 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB]); | by applicant | WO8601533 | US4703039 | US4975278 | WO9114438 | WO9321232 | WO9632478 | WO9743316 | US5747035 | US5869046 | WO9943713 | WO0009560 | WO0042072 | WO0061739 | WO0231240 | WO02060919 | EP1391213 | US6946292 | WO2006130834 | US7214775 | US7498298 | US7659241 | WO2011130613 | WO2012163805 | WO2013072415 | WO2013072406 | WO2013154760 | WO2014068079 | WO2014089335 | WO2014122143 | WO2014122144 | WO2014140248 | WO2014152199 | WO2015052536 | WO2015077605 | WO2015158671 | WO2015166649 | WO2016014789 | WO2016014565 | WO2016020332 | WO2016079177 | WO2016090320 | WO2016090327 | WO2017021450 | WO2017051068 | US2017165373 |