EP4147225 - DYNAMIC POWER CONVERTER SWITCHING FOR DISPLAYS BASED ON PREDICTED POWER USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ji Hoon Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Sun-il Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
YOUN, Sang Young Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | Stott, James Edward Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 20753515.4 | 10.07.2020 | [2023/11] | WO2020US41613 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022010490 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147225 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
G09G3/342 (EP);
G09G3/3233 (US);
G09G3/3258 (US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP);
G09G2320/0247 (EP);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE STROMRICHTERSCHALTUNG FÜR ANZEIGEN AUF BASIS EINES PROGNOSTIZIERTEN STROMVERBRAUCHS | [2023/11] | English: | DYNAMIC POWER CONVERTER SWITCHING FOR DISPLAYS BASED ON PREDICTED POWER USAGE | [2023/11] | French: | COMMUTATION DE CONVERTISSEUR D'ÉNERGIE DYNAMIQUE POUR AFFICHAGES SUR LA BASE D'UNE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE PRÉDITE | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 05.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2016358526 (WANG CHAOHAO [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9-11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0045]; figure 9 * [I] 2,3,5,8; | [Y]US2017018230 (IM TAEGON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-11* paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2020219429 (CALLWAY ED [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0136]; figures 18-24 * |