Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.08.2024 | First examination report | |
29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
08.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.04.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
29.04.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.04.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
06.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.11.2021 | Change - representative | |
05.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.01.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
17.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |