Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022252901 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017595719 | 17.07.2020 | WO2020US42488 | 17.07.2020 | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220038371 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US42488 | 17.07.2020 | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022544006 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US42488 | 17.07.2020 | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114144720 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US42488 | 17.07.2020 | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020317011 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US42488 | 17.07.2020 | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4004636 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US42488 | 17.07.2020 | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021016067 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962877912 | 24.07.2019 |