EP4014211 - OBJECT WHICH COMPRISES FLUORESCENCE MARKER ARTICLES AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polysecure GmbH Sankt-Georgener Str. 19 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOESSLEIN, Jochen c/o Polysecure GmbH Sankt-Georgener Str. 19, Geb. 23 79111 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
HEINRICH, Jürgen c/o Polysecure GmbH Sankt-Georgener Str. 19, Geb. 23 79111 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
KATUS, Philip c/o Polysecure GmbH Sankt-Georgener Str. 19, Geb. 23 79111 Freiburg / DE | 04 /
KIRCHENBAUER, Daniel c/o Polysecure GmbH Sankt-Georgener Str. 19, Geb. 23 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Erbacher, Martin Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20754154.1 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020DE100626 | Priority number, date | DE201910122010 | 15.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019122010 | [2022/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021027989 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014211 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/1205, G07D7/202 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G07D7/1205 (EP);
G01N21/643 (CN,US);
B42D25/382 (US);
B42D25/305 (US);
B42D25/351 (US);
B42D25/387 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | GEGENSTAND, DER FLUORESZENZ-MARKERARTIKEL UMFASST, UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG DESSELBEN | [2022/25] | English: | OBJECT WHICH COMPRISES FLUORESCENCE MARKER ARTICLES AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING SAME | [2022/25] | French: | OBJET QUI COMPREND DES PARTICULES DE MARQUEURS DE FLUORESCENCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 08.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102010026627 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]); | [I]DE102017008970 (GIESECKE DEVRIENT CURRENCY TECH GMBH [DE]); | [XI]US2019184724 (HOOK JAROSLAV [US]) |