EP4010073 - METHOD FOR USE WITH A RADIOTHERAPY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elekta Limited Cornerstone London Road Crawley RH10 9RR / GB | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLINT, Chris C/O Elekta Limited Cornerstone London Road Crawley RH10 9RR / GB | 02 /
VEGA, German C/O Elekta Limited Cornerstone London Road Crawley RH10 9RR / GB | 03 /
RICHARDSON, Keith C/O Elekta Limited Cornerstone London Road Crawley RH10 9RR / GB | 04 /
CHIAP, Alessandra C/O Elekta Limited Cornerstone London Road Crawley RH10 9RR / GB | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | St Clair Jones, Gregory Arthur Langley, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20754205.1 | 05.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020EP72066 | Priority number, date | GB20190011178 | 05.08.2019 Original published format: GB 201911178 | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023797 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010073 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
A61N5/1048 (EP,US);
H05H7/04 (GB,US);
A61N2005/1089 (EP,US);
A61N5/1081 (EP);
H05H2007/045 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINER STRAHLENTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/24] | English: | METHOD FOR USE WITH A RADIOTHERAPY DEVICE | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 04.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9012413 (UNIV LOMA LINDA MED [US]) [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 11 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XI]EP1454657 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] - [0053] , [0088] - [0099] * * figures 1,16,17 * [I] 3-8; | [A] - SONG YOUNG-GI, "Interlock system for machine protection of the KOMAC 100-MeV proton linac", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, KOREAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, KR, vol. 66, no. 3, doi:10.3938/JKPS.66.449, ISSN 0374-4884, (20150222), pages 449 - 453, (20150222), XP035455003 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3938/jkps.66.449 |