EP4017781 - STEERING COLUMN FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2022/39] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | ||
For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2022/26] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | ||
For all designated states Thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Sebastian Dums 7 6811 Göfis / AT | 02 /
SPECHT, Jean-Pierre Giessenstrasse 15 9469 Haag / CH | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20754726.6 | 11.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020EP72441 | Priority number, date | DE201910212435 | 20.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019212435 | [2022/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032525 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017781 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4017781 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/181, B62D1/19 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
B62D1/181 (EP,CN);
B62D1/192 (EP,CN);
B62D1/195 (EP,CN);
F16H25/00 (CN);
F16H25/24 (EP);
F16H2025/2084 (EP);
F16H2025/209 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKSÄULE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2022/26] | English: | STEERING COLUMN FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2022/26] | French: | COLONNE DE DIRECTION POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 21.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2004041388 (MULLER OLAF [DE]); | [XAI]JP2007125956 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [XAI]JP2008056132 (NSK LTD) | Examination | WO2020078877 | by applicant | DE10259596 | DE102018204735 |