EP3925593 - DENTAL MILL BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIGUCHI, Hirotaka c/o KURARAY NORITAKE DENTAL INC., 2-28, Kurashiki- cho Tainai-shi, Niigata 959-2653 / JP | 02 /
NISHIGAKI, Naoki c/o KURARAY NORITAKE DENTAL INC., 2-28, Kurashiki- cho Tainai-shi, Niigata 959-2653 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
HORIGUCHI, Hirotaka Tainai-shi, Niigata 959-2653 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIGAKI, Naoki Tainai-shi, Niigata 959-2653 / JP | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20755452.8 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020JP05604 | Priority number, date | JP20190024811 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019024811 | [2021/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020166667 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925593 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61K6/831, A61K6/887, A61C5/77, A61L27/10, A61L27/16, A61L27/44, A61L27/50, A61K6/77, A61K6/71 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61C13/0022 (EP,US);
A61K6/77 (EP);
A61K6/831 (EP);
C08F20/14 (US);
C08F22/22 (US);
C08K7/14 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | A61K6/831, A61K6/887, A61C5/77, A61L27/10, A61L27/16, A61L27/44, A61L27/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | ROHLING FÜR EINE DENTALFRÄSE | [2021/51] | English: | DENTAL MILL BLANK | [2021/51] | French: | ÉBAUCHE DE FRAISAGE DENTAIRE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2021 | Translation filed | 06.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 20.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/51] | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2355581 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 25 *; | [A]WO2008000917 (STICK TECH OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15* page 13, line 18 - page 24, line 12; examples 1-2; table 1 *; | [A]WO2009144901 (KURARAY MEDICAL INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0038] - [0042] - [0051]; examples 1-12; tables 1,2 *; | [X]WO2009154301 (ADVANCE KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 65, line 26 - page 69, line 22; examples 8,9; table 1 *; | [A] - Bijelic-Donova Jasmina, "Discontinuous fiber-reinforced composite for dental reconstructions - Studies of the fracture resistance and the mechanical properties of the material used for extensive direct restorations.", ISBN 978-951-29-6652-3, (20161201), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/315270061_Discontinuous_fiber-reinforced_composite_for_dental_reconstructions_-_Studies_of_the_fracture_resistance_and_the_mechanical_properties_of_the_material_used_for_extensive_direct_restorations, (20221130), XP093003757 [A] 1-15 * page 44, line 1 - page 56, line 22; table 5 * | International search | [A]US2006208393 (KARMAKER AJIT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims, examples *; | [X]WO2009144901 (KURARAY MEDICAL INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims, paragraphs [0002], [0038]-[0042], [0051], examples *; | [Y]JP2018090533 (KURARAY NORITAKE DENTAL INC) [Y] 1-15 * claims, paragraphs [0001], [0009], [0028]-[0029], [0078], example of production of polymerizable monomer-containing compositions 1-5, 7, 8, examples 1-5, 7-11, test examples 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2018195639 (ANGELUS IND DE PRODUTOS ODONTOLOGICOS S/A [BR]) [Y] 1-15 * claims, paragraphs [0017]-[0018], examples *; | [Y]US2018360575 (REYNAUD PIERRE-LUC [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0006], [0037]-[0038], examples *; | [PA]WO2019054507 (TOKUYAMA DENTAL CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-15 * claims, examples *; | [PA]JP2019058323 (SUN MEDICAL CO LTD) [PA] 1-15* claims, examples *; | [PA]JP2019116431 (KURARAY NORITAKE DENTAL INC) [PA] 1-15 * claims, examples * | by applicant | JPH093109 | JPH10245525 | WO2010109496 | WO2012042911 | WO2017098096 | WO2018195639 |