EP3924323 - TRICYCLODECANE DIMETHANOL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dairen Chemical Corporation 7F, No. 301 Songkiang Road Zhongshan District Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | For all designated states Chang Chun Plastics Co., Ltd. 7F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd. Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City 104 / TW | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Shih-Feng 9F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | 02 /
HUANG, Ching-Jui 9F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | 03 /
WANG, Hsing-Yun 9F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | 04 /
CHOU, June-Yen 9F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
CHIU, Shih-Feng Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | ||
02 /
HUANG, Ching-Jui Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | |||
03 /
WANG, Hsing-Yun Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | |||
04 /
CHOU, June-Yen Taipei City, Taiwan 104 / TW | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20755477.5 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020CN75315 | Priority number, date | US201916276237 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: US201916276237 | US202062960382P | 13.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062960382 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020164598 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924323 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/80, C07C47/347, C07C45/50, C07C29/141, C07C31/27, C08G63/199 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
C08G63/199 (EP,KR);
C07C31/278 (EP);
C07C35/23 (KR);
C07C35/37 (KR);
G02B1/04 (KR);
C07C2603/68 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | C07C29/141, C07C29/74, C07C31/27, C07C35/37, C07C45/80, C08G63/199 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | TRICYCLODECANDIMETHANOLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/51] | English: | TRICYCLODECANE DIMETHANOL COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRICYCLODÉCANE DIMÉTHANOL ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 10.01.2022 | Observations by third parties | 01.07.2022 | Observations by third parties | 15.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005107644 (LAPPE PETER [DE], et al); | International search | [X]GB1170226 (FALBE JUERGEN [DE]); | [X]JPH11100339 (KURARAY CO); | [X]US6365782 (NAKAMURA KENICHI [JP], et al); | [X]JP2003146931 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [X]CN1636950 (CELANESE CHEM EUROP GMBH [DE]); | [X]CN1890203 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]CN101353419 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]); | [X]CN101497561 (IND TECHNOLOGY RES INST TAIWAN [CN]) | other | US2005107644 |