EP3924266 - FOLDING LINE PREVENTIVE CARRIER BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toprak, Muhammet Fatih Balikli Cirpici Yolu Cad. Kiptas Merkez Evleri 2 Etap B3 Blok Daire:31 Zeytinburnu/Istanbul / TR | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Kayahan, Senem Senem Kayahan Patent Danismanlik Ltd. Sti. Tepe Prime, Mustafa Kemal Mahallesi Dumlupinar Bulvari No: 266A, ic Kapi No: 18 06510 Çankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Sevinç, Cenk Grup Ofis Marka Patent A.S. Ataturk Bulvari 211/11 Kavaklidere 06680 Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 20755479.1 | 08.01.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020TR50011 | Priority number, date | TR20190002347 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: TR 201902347 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020167271 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3924266 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/04, A45C11/36 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
B42F7/025 (EP);
A45C11/24 (EP);
A45C2200/10 (EP);
A45F2200/055 (EP);
B42P2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | TRAGETASCHE ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON FALTLINIEN | [2021/51] | English: | FOLDING LINE PREVENTIVE CARRIER BAG | [2021/51] | French: | SAC DE TRANSPORT DE PRÉVENTION DE LIGNE DE PLIAGE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1030813 (SOENNECKEN FA F); | [A]GB2428637 (WORRILL DAVID JOHN [GB]); | [A]EP1428682 (HIRANO CHIYOKO [JP]) | International search | [Y]US4801010 (LEVITAS MIRIAM S [US]) [Y] 1-4 * Abstract; Description, column 2 line 15-25 and 46-50, column 3 line 13-24, line 33-36 and 59-68, column 4 line 1-5 and 13-17, Fig. 1-4D *; | [Y]US4901897 (BRIGGS MARCIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * Abstract; Description, column 2 line 11-20 and 45-58, column 3 line 23-33 and 42-46, claim 1, Fig. 1-5B *; | [Y]JPH0272053 (NAKAMURA SEITAI CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * Abstract, Fig. 1-3 *; | [A]US5018609 (BRENNER BARRY H [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1103387 (TEIKOKU PRINTING INK MFG [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * Abstract; Description page 3 para. [0021] and [0022]; Fig. 1-4 *; | [A]US2004195121 (JANNOUN JANET [US]) [A] 1-4 * Abstract, Description page 1 para. [0013]; page 2 para. [0029], [0030] and [0033], Fig. 1-7 *; | [A]CN207506079U (WANG JIAOYANG) [A] 1-4 * Abstract, Fig. 1-3 * |