EP3924896 - APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR NEURAL NETWORK COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYTEKIN, Caglar Riihuhdankatu 13 B 6 33580 Tampere / FI | 02 /
CRICRI, Francesco Massunkuja 1 A 14 33100 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
AYTEKIN, Caglar 33580 Tampere / FI | ||
02 /
CRICRI, Francesco 33100 Tampere / FI | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 20755596.2 | 29.01.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020FI50045 | Priority number, date | FI20190005116 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: FI 20195116 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165491 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924896 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/08, H03M7/40, G06K9/62, G06N20/00, G06N3/063, G06V10/764, G06V10/82, H03M7/30, // G06N3/04 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H03M7/3068 (EP,US);
G06N3/063 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/082 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | G06N3/08, H03M7/40, G06K9/62, G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPRESSION VON NEURONALEN NETZEN | [2021/51] | English: | APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR NEURAL NETWORK COMPRESSION | [2021/51] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMPRESSION DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2017270408 (SHI CHAO [HK], et al); |