EP3923872 - IMPLANTABLE OBJECTS FABRICATED BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING AND METHODS OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flex Memory Ventures Pty Ltd C/- CT Accountants Australia Suite 303 21-23 Burwood Road Burwood NSW 2134 / AU | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LATHABAI, Srinivasarao C/- Wollongong Private Hospital, Level 7, 360-364 Crown Street Wollongong, New South Wales 2500 / AU | 02 /
GOZUKARA, Meltem Yesim C/- Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 03 /
RITCHIE, David James Bell C/- Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 04 /
VENKATESAN, Kishore C/- Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
LATHABAI, Srinivasarao Wollongong, New South Wales 2500 / AU | ||
02 /
GOZUKARA, Meltem Yesim Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | |||
03 /
RITCHIE, David James Bell Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | |||
04 /
VENKATESAN, Kishore Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20756180.4 | 13.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020AU50122 | Priority number, date | AU20190900458 | 13.02.2019 Original published format: AU 2019900458 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163915 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923872 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/915, A61F2/28, A61L31/02, B33Y80/00, B33Y10/00, B22F3/105, A61F2/30, B22F3/11, B22F10/36, B22F10/47, B22F10/62, B33Y40/20, B22F5/10, B22F10/28, B22F10/366, // C22C1/04 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,AU,US);
B22F10/62 (EP,AU,US);
A61F2/02 (AU);
A61F2/28 (AU,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP);
A61F2/89 (AU,US);
A61L31/022 (EP,AU);
A61L31/14 (AU);
B22F10/28 (EP,AU,US);
B22F10/36 (EP,US);
B22F10/366 (EP,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F10/68 (US);
B22F12/47 (US);
B22F3/1115 (EP);
B22F5/10 (EP);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,AU,US);
A61F2/915 (EP);
A61F2002/30092 (AU);
A61F2002/30985 (EP);
A61F2002/91575 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,AU,US);
A61F2240/001 (EP,AU,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,AU,US);
A61L2400/16 (EP,AU);
B22F10/364 (EP,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,US);
B22F2301/15 (AU);
B22F2301/205 (AU,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
C22C1/0433 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/62, C23F1/00, C25F3/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | A61F2/915, A61F2/28, A61L31/02, B33Y80/00, B33Y10/00, B22F3/105 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | DURCH GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG HERGESTELLTE IMPLANTIERBARE OBJEKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/51] | English: | IMPLANTABLE OBJECTS FABRICATED BY ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING AND METHODS OF FABRICATING THE SAME | [2021/51] | French: | OBJETS IMPLANTABLES FABRIQUÉS PAR FABRICATION ADDITIVE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2022 | 28.02.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6375826 (WANG JINGLI [US], et al) [Y] 11 * column 5, line 32 - line 35 * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [YA]US2006198750 (FURST JOSEPH G [US], et al) [Y] 11 * page 8, column l, line 32 - line 35 * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [YA]US2008121530 (PIESSLINGER-SCHWEIGER SIEGFRIE [DE], et al) [Y] 12 * abstract * [A] 1-11,13-15; | [XYI]US2008131479 (WEBER JAN [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,13-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0071] * [Y] 3,4,6,7,9-12 [I] 5,8; | [XYI]US2010070022 (KUEHLING MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0047] * * figure 2A * [Y] 3,4,6,7,9-12 [I] 5,8; | [YA]US2015132173 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0037] *[A] 1-5,7-15; | [YA]US2017014235 (JONES ERIC [IE], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0109] * [A] 1-8,11-15; | [YA]CN107802886 (CHENGDU YUYA SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [Y] 3,4,7 * paragraph [0010] * [A] 1,2,5,8-15; | [XYI]CN108403256 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [X] 1,2,13-15 * claim - * * figure 4 * [Y] 3,4,6,7,9-12 [I] 5,8 | International search | [A]US6375826 (WANG JINGLI [US], et al) [A] 19, 20 * column 5 lines 49 to 53 *; | [A]US2006198750 (FURST JOSEPH G [US], et al) [A] 21, 23 * page 8 column 1 lines 32 to 35 *; | [A]US2008121530 (PIESSLINGER-SCHWEIGER SIEGFRIE [DE], et al) [A] 22 * abstract *; | [X]US2008131479 (WEBER JAN [NL], et al) [X] 1-31 * paragraphs 2, 51 and 85 *; | [X]US2010070022 (KUEHLING MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1-31 * paragraphs 25 to 27, 36, 47 *; | [A]US2015132173 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 7* paragraph 37 *; | [A]US2017014235 (JONES ERIC [IE], et al) [A] 17, 18 * paragraph 109 lines 1 to 6 *; | [A]CN107802886 (CHENGDU YUYA SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 3-5, 8, 9 * paragraph 10 *; | [X]CN108403256 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [X] 1-31 * whole document * | by applicant | US2008131479 | US2010070022 | CN108403256 |