Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.08.2024 | First examination report | |
27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.01.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 | Change - classification | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 | Change - classification | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
14.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
14.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
22.04.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
22.04.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.02.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.11.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
26.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.08.2021 | Change - representative | |
16.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.08.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |