EP3906715 - METHOD AND UE FOR PERFORMING RID UPDATE IN UE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Lalith 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 02 /
MADHURAPANTULA, Shweta 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 03 /
SHAH, Nitesh Pushpak 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
KUMAR, Lalith Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
MADHURAPANTULA, Shweta Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | |||
03 /
SHAH, Nitesh Pushpak Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20756693.6 | 17.02.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020KR02256 | Priority number, date | IN201941006133 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: IN201941006133 | IN201941006133 | 11.02.2020 Original published format: IN201941006133 | IN202042006264 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: IN202042006264 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020167099 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3906715 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/19, H04W60/00, H04W60/04, H04W60/06, // H04W8/02, H04W40/36, H04W76/34, H04W88/06 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H04W76/19 (EP);
H04W8/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L45/14 (US);
H04L45/028 (US);
H04W24/04 (US);
H04W36/0033 (US);
H04W40/36 (EP,KR);
H04W60/005 (EP,US);
H04W60/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W60/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/34 (EP);
H04W8/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | H04W8/02, H04W60/04, H04W60/06, H04W40/36, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERGERÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON RID-AKTUALISIERUNG IN EINEM BENUTZERGERÄT IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2021/45] | English: | METHOD AND UE FOR PERFORMING RID UPDATE IN UE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET EU POUR EFFECTUER UNE MISE À JOUR D'ID DE ROUTAGE DANS UN EU DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016270024 (NAKATA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); |