EP4014666 - SIGNALING LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 Luleå / SE | 02 /
BERGSTRÖM, Mattias Fjärdingsmansvägen 220 192 70 Sollentuna / SE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20757304.9 | 13.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020EP72813 | Priority number, date | US201962886599P | 14.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962886599 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028553 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4014666 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W74/0816 (US);
H04W16/14 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W74/002 (CN);
H04W74/006 (CN,KR,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,US);
H04W74/0866 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG VON LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK-PARAMETERN | [2022/25] | English: | SIGNALING LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK PARAMETERS | [2022/25] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE PARAMÈTRES CSMA | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 10.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2018088422 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [Y]EP3499976 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [P]EP3541139 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); |