EP4034431 - THREE-PART HOUSING FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/31] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTELLI, Bruno 23 RUE D'ALSACE 92300 LEVALLOIS PERRET / FR | 02 /
FALER, Matthieu 6 RUE DE LA LIBERATION 91690 SACLAS / FR | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20757627.3 | 22.07.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020FR51329 | Priority number, date | FR20190010516 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1910516 | [2022/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058884 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034431 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4034431 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M10/613, H01M10/6563, H01M10/66, H01M50/204, H01M50/271, H01M50/296, H01M50/502, H01M10/625, B60R16/04 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
B60R16/04 (EP);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN);
H01M10/625 (EP,CN);
H01M10/6563 (EP,CN);
H01M10/66 (EP);
H01M50/184 (CN);
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/249 (CN);
H01M50/271 (EP);
H01M50/296 (EP);
H01M50/502 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | B60R16/04, H01M10/625 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREITEILIGES GEHÄUSE FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUGBATTERIE | [2022/31] | English: | THREE-PART HOUSING FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE BATTERY | [2022/31] | French: | CARTER EN TROIS PARTIES POUR UNE BATTERIE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 07.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4054730 (CRIFASI SALVATORE) [A] 1-3,9 * column 2, line 4 - line 17 *; | [A]US5031712 (KAROLEK NEIL C [US], et al) [A] 1,5-9 * column 4, line 14 - line 65 *; | [A]EP0704918 (GLOBE UNION INC [US]) [A] 1-4,9 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 12 *; | [A]US5681668 (REED MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 3 *; | [A]FR2898094 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1,8,9 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 17 *; | [A]FR2997559 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-3,9 * page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 5 *; | [A]WO2016032945 (FEDERAL MOGUL POWERTRAIN INC [US]) [A] 1,9* paragraph [0028] * | by applicant | FR2987499 | FR20190010516 |