EP4013960 - WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH A GURNEY FLAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Curve ApS Kastetvej 2 St 9000 9000 Aalborg / DK | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUDERN, Nicholas c/o POWER CURVE APS, Kastetvej 2, st. 9000 Aalborg / DK | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Münzer, Marc Eric Aalborg Patent ApS Algade 38, 3 9000 Aalborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 20757879.0 | 14.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020EP72875 | Priority number, date | DK2019PA70517 | 14.08.2019 Original published format: DK PA201970517 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028573 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013960 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
F03D1/0645 (EP);
F03D1/0633 (US);
F03D1/06495 (EP);
F05B2240/301 (US);
F05B2240/304 (EP,US);
F05B2240/305 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT EINER GURNEY-KLAPPE | [2022/25] | English: | WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH A GURNEY FLAP | [2022/25] | French: | PALE D'ÉOLIENNE À VOLET DE GURNEY | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 02.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DK9500009U (HENRIK STIESDAL BONUS ENERGY A [DK]); | [A]EP2022979 (GAMESA INNOVATION & TECH SL [ES]); | [YD]GB2526847 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [XY]US2017082088 (YARBROUGH AARON A [US], et al); | [Y]EP3204634 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [X]CN108716451 (ZHONGKE GUOFENG DETECTION TIANJIN CO LTD) | by applicant | DK9500009U | EP1314885 | EP1845258 | WO2008113349 | WO2011042528 | WO2011157849 | WO2013137716 | WO2014059989 | US8834127 | GB2526847 | WO2016055076 | EP2713044 | CN107084092 | EP3510276 | WO2019138008 |