EP4017956 - DETERGENT SOLID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Liam, Edward Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
BOUX DE CASSON, Alexandre, François Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/26] | Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 20758222.2 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020EP73324 | Priority number, date | EP20190192833 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192833 | EP20190192827 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192827 | EP20190192831 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192831 | EP20190192834 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192834 | EP20190192836 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192836 | EP20190192828 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192828 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032833 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017956 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4017956 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/33, C11D3/40, C11D17/04, C11D7/26, C11D7/32, // C11D17/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/2075 (EP,CN);
C11D17/0091 (EP,CN);
C11D17/06 (CN);
C11D3/2086 (EP,CN);
C11D3/33 (EP,CN);
C11D3/40 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | C11D3/20, C11D3/33, C11D3/40, C11D17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/26] | English: | DETERGENT SOLID COMPOSITION | [2022/26] | French: | COMPOSITION DÉTERGENTE SOLIDE | [2022/45] |
Former [2022/26] | COMPOSITION SOLIDE DE DÉTERGENT | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 14.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | IE | 20.08.2023 | LU | 20.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
IE | 20.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6221834 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009092699 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2016186098 (HUEFFER STEPHAN [DE], et al) | Examination | EP2794836 | US2017198241 | by applicant | EP0070074 | US4751015 | EP0328177 | EP0384070 | US5041232 | US5047163 | EP0458397 | WO2005003274 | WO2006027086 | WO2006032327 | WO2006032397 | WO2006045275 | WO2008017570 | WO2008087497 | WO2008141880 | WO2009132870 | WO2009141173 | WO2010099997 | WO2010102861 | WO2010148624 | WO2011011799 | WO2014086662 |