EP3929224 - PHOTOCURABLE RESIN COMPOSITION AND 3D STEREOLITHOGRAPHY PRODUCT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION 1-17, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION 1-17, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-8668 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE Koji c/o NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION, 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | 02 /
OZOE Hiroaki c/o NAGASE CHEMTEX CORPORATION, 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
WATANABE Koji Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | ||
02 /
OZOE Hiroaki Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20758578.7 | 14.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP05904 | Priority number, date | JP20190027834 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019027834 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020170990 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929224 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/06, C08F2/44, C08F2/50, B29C64/314 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B33Y70/10 (EP,KR);
C08F290/062 (KR);
C08F2/50 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/129 (EP,US);
B29C64/343 (KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (US);
C08F2/44 (EP,KR);
C08F220/20 (US);
C08F220/306 (US);
C08F222/1065 (US);
C08F224/00 (US);
C08F265/06 (KR);
C08F290/067 (EP);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR,US);
C08K5/5397 (US);
C08K9/04 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/067, C08F220/20 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/282 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/301 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/302 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | PHOTOHÄRTBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND 3D-STEREOLITHOGRAPHIEPRODUKT DAMIT | [2021/52] | English: | PHOTOCURABLE RESIN COMPOSITION AND 3D STEREOLITHOGRAPHY PRODUCT USING SAME | [2021/52] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE PHOTODURCISSABLE, ET PRODUIT DE STÉRÉOLITOGRAPHIE 3D L'UTILISANT | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | Translation filed | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2016112824 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [X] 1-21* paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0040] , [0041] , [0056]; claim - * | International search | [A]JP2016065212 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-17; | [A]JP2016112824 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [A] 1-17; | [A]WO2017047615 (KJ CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17; | [PA]WO2019035387 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [PA] 1-17; | [PA]JP2019099750 (NAGASE CHEMTEX CORP)[PA] 1-17 |