EP3929229 - POLYURETHANE FOR COSMETIC PREPARATIONS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE FOR COSMETIC PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADEKA CORPORATION 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZONO, Keitarou c/o ADEKA CORPORATION, 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | 02 /
MATSUKURA, Noriyoshi c/o ADEKA CORPORATION, 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | 03 /
TSUSHIMA, Yasuhiro c/o ADEKA CORPORATION, 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAI, Hiroaki c/o ADEKA CORPORATION, 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
MIYAZONO, Keitarou Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUKURA, Noriyoshi Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUSHIMA, Yasuhiro Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIRAI, Hiroaki Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20758579.5 | 17.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP05985 | Priority number, date | JP20190027294 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019027294 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171002 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929229 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, A61K8/87, A61Q5/06, C08G18/66, C08G18/32 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,KR);
C08G18/755 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/87 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/12 (US);
C08G18/0823 (EP);
C08G18/302 (KR);
C08G18/305 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/3228 (KR);
C08G18/348 (EP,US);
C08G18/4211 (EP);
C08G18/4213 (US);
C08G18/4216 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (KR);
C08G18/6607 (US);
C08G18/6625 (US);
C08G18/6659 (EP);
C08G18/73 (KR);
C08G18/751 (KR);
C09D175/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/302 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/305 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/52] | C08G18/08, A61K8/87, A61Q5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | POLYURETHAN FÜR KOSMETISCHE PRÄPARATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHAN FÜR KOSMETISCHE PRÄPARATE | [2021/52] | English: | POLYURETHANE FOR COSMETIC PREPARATIONS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE FOR COSMETIC PREPARATIONS | [2021/52] | French: | POLYURÉTHANE POUR DES PRÉPARATIONS COSMÉTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE POLYURÉTHANE POUR DES PRÉPARATIONS COSMÉTIQUES | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2021 | Translation filed | 12.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US7452525 (BEREZKIN YULIYA [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10-14 * column 9; example 5 * * column 7, line 29 - line 30 * * claim 13 *[A] 2,3,9; | [X]US2009257960 (KIM SON NGUYEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 20 - page 21; examples PU-1; table 1 * * claim 12 * * example 4; table 2 * * paragraph [0404]; example 1 *; | [XI]US2013331511 (KITADA MITSURU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * page 8 - page 10; example 4; table 2 * * paragraph [0114] * * page 8; examples PES5, PES2; table 1 * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0074] * [I] 9; | [XA]WO2018227645 (WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-5,7-12 * page 5 - page 6; example 1 * * example 4 * * paragraph [0021] * [A] 6,13,14 | International search | [A]JPH11228363 (NIPPON NSC LTD)[A] 1-14; | [X]JPH11310520 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST) [X] 1-14 * claims, paragraphs [0019]-[0021], column "examples" (for example, example 23), etc. *; | [X]JP2004504464 (NOVEON IP HOLDINGS CORP.) [X] 1-14 * claims, paragraph [0030], column "examples", etc. *; | [X]JP2009535382 (BASF SE) [X] 1-14 * claims, paragraphs [0160], [0195], [0257], column "examples", etc. *; | [X]WO2012114833 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims, paragraphs [0013], [0063], [0114], column "examples", etc. * | by applicant | WO07509741 | JPH05262622 | JP2003137730 | WO2008035563 | JP2016117715 |